Financial history 8TH TONBRIDGE (HILDENBOROUGH) SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 303464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.69k £24.17k £15.07k £14.11k £16.51k
Total expenditure £30.77k £7.90k £6.51k £17.93k £23.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.19k £10.67k N/A N/A