Accounts and annual returns STAVERTON COURTROOM AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 1064041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 January 2022 357 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required