Financial history STAVERTON COURTROOM AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 1064041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.63k £15.18k £27.76k £10.61k £10.07k
Total expenditure £7.35k £5.20k £8.55k £14.02k £13.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k £18.67k £600 £300