Accounts and annual returns ST GEORGES PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1061202
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 06 August 2024 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 06 August 2024 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 August 2023 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 08 August 2023 39 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 September 2022 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 09 September 2022 71 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 23 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 05 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window