Trustees ST GEORGES PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1061202
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marianna Dimakopoulos Trustee 17 October 2024
None on record
Lisa-Marie Anthony Trustee 14 October 2024
None on record
Lucy Poole Trustee 04 March 2024
None on record
Sophie Martin Trustee 24 February 2024
None on record
Cassie Lewis Trustee 10 November 2022
None on record
Natasha Grange Trustee 08 November 2021
None on record
Carmine Maietta Trustee 09 September 2019
None on record