Financial history KIDDERMINSTER FESTIVAL OF DANCE

Charity Number: 1062294
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008 30/09/2009
Total gross income £4.81k £5.44k £6.05k £6.47k £5.79k
Total expenditure £2.95k £3.24k £4.39k £4.87k £4.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A