Accounts and annual returns 14TH HACKNEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303667
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 04 April 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 04 April 2013 04 June 2014 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2013 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2012 27 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2012 Not Required