Financial history COMBE FLOREY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 304521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.06k £22.16k £13.82k £4.70k £5.49k
Total expenditure £3.73k £3.84k £5.74k £13.18k £5.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.67k £11.67k N/A N/A