Trustees COMBE FLOREY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 304521

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP RONALD GREENWAY | Chair | 12 March 1994 |
|
|
||||
Susan Greenway | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacquey Newton | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Scott | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Irene Cleverly | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Scott | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Totman | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
LUCINDA BOTTARD | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jean Phillips | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER CLIMO | Trustee | 12 March 2006 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS CHARLES FLITTON | Trustee | 12 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA MARY FLITTON | Trustee | 12 March 1993 |
|
|
||||
LINDA JACQUELINE WOODWARD | Trustee | 12 March 1981 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.