Financial history THE CONYGRE TRUST

Charity number: 304658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £53.54k £43.34k £47.22k £47.41k £69.47k
Total expenditure £41.32k £34.87k £38.89k £75.65k £98.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.57k £10.69k N/A N/A