Trustees THE CONYGRE TRUST
Charity number: 304658

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Perryman | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lewis | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Boxall | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary-Anne Ansell | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Warrener | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Kendall | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Cooper Bradley | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Ann Carroll | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND ARTHUR MERCHANT | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
KELVIN HANCOCK | Trustee | 20 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JANET MERCHANT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.