Trustees THE COLLINGBOURNE KINGSTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carel Bouwens Chair 12 September 2014
None on record
Edward Ralph Johnston Mack Trustee 20 March 2024
None on record
Anthony Rupert Gordon Mindelsohn Trustee 26 January 2024
None on record
Mark Stuart Freeta Trustee 11 August 2023
None on record
Barry Richard Newson Trustee 07 April 2022
None on record