Trustees THE OAKSEY VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 305557

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tessa Lucinda Carnegie Hall | Chair | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Graham | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Thomas | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Graham | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Francis Brackley | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
COL NICHOLAS MANGNALL OBE | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Oaksey Parish Council | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.