Financial history DEVON MASONIC EDUCATIONAL FUND

Charity number: 306693
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2005 30/11/2006 30/11/2007 30/11/2008 30/11/2009
Total gross income £18.76k £19.29k £21.90k £20.32k £17.70k
Total expenditure £14.50k £10.32k £23.59k £19.37k £20.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A