Accounts and annual returns HILDA SOUTHGATE DOMESTIC SCIENCE GIFT IN CONNEXION WITH TEIGNMOUTH HIGH SCHOOL AND COMMUNITY COLLEGE

Charity number: 306700
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 09 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 30 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 07 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required