Financial history HILDA SOUTHGATE DOMESTIC SCIENCE GIFT IN CONNEXION WITH TEIGNMOUTH HIGH SCHOOL AND COMMUNITY COLLEGE

Charity number: 306700
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £122 £121 £127 £140 £150
Total expenditure £120 £130 £0 £150 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A