Accounts and annual returns WYKEHAM HOUSE SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 307339
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2014 11 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 11 February 2015 On Time