Financial history WYKEHAM HOUSE SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 307339
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2010 31/07/2011 31/07/2012 31/07/2013 31/07/2014
Total gross income £1.65m £1.58m £1.52m £1.43m £1.47m
Total expenditure £1.69m £1.58m £1.51m £1.50m £1.57m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £1.34m £1.36m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.65m £1.58m £1.42m £0 £8
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £153 £246 £133 £91 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £97.61k £92.10k £110.11k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.68m £1.58m £1.49m £1.48m £1.56m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.98k £5.13k £5.08k £4.70k £5.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £10.48k £0 £0