Accounts and annual returns THE JOHN STANLEY JEFFRIES SWIMMING POOL TRUST

Charity Number: 308037
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 16 July 2006 30 March 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 July 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 20 February 2006 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 20 February 2006 20 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 07 April 2005 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 22 January 2005 On Time