Accounts and annual returns THE TAPLOW AND HITCHAM RECREATION GROUNDS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 308328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required