Accounts and annual returns TYLDESLEY AND DISTRICT HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1073226
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2012 24 August 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2011 24 August 2012 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2010 05 February 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2009 19 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not Required