Accounts and annual returns THE NUMBER ONE COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1068368
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 11 February 2011 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 09 November 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 03 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 21 December 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 06 February 2009 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 06 February 2009 6 days late