Accounts and annual returns Q.E.G.S. COVENANT FUND

Charity number: 1069205
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2013 29 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2012 13 May 2013 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2011 21 March 2012 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 Not Required