Financial history Q.E.G.S. COVENANT FUND

Charity number: 1069205
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2009 05/04/2010 05/04/2011 05/04/2012 05/04/2013
Total gross income £762 £1.61k £1.17k £895 £612
Total expenditure £0 £850 £750 £1.50k £200
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A