Governing document LONG WHATTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JANUARY 1992 AS AMENDED 9 MARCH 1993, 8 MARCH 1994, 9 SEPTEMBER AND 9 DECEMBER 1997. FURTHER AMENDED 8 JUNE 1999 AND 11 JANUARY 2000.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX SEXUAL ORIENTATION RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
LONG WHATTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.