Trustees LONG WHATTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1067789

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vivienne Matravers | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Keith Nicholls | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Chadwin | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sonya Buzzard | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Neil | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Freestone | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penny de kock | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Kenneth Taylor | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mike Hampton | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Silke Walker | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFERY SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUE BIRD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.