Trustees ASHMORE PARK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1061701
Charity reporting is overdue by 459 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Douglas Clarke Chair 13 November 2013
None on record
Jordan Peter Clarke Trustee 12 December 2017
None on record
Christine Phillips Trustee 28 June 2016
None on record
Melvyn Phillips Trustee 23 June 2015
None on record
Lindsey Marie Williams Trustee 23 June 2015
None on record
Sarah Levy Trustee 15 January 2014
None on record
Vivien Matthews Trustee 13 November 2013
None on record
Susan Ward Trustee 13 November 2013
None on record
ANGELA HALL Trustee 30 November 2011
None on record