Accounts and annual returns ALCOHOL PROBLEMS ADVISORY SERVICE
Charity number: 1070109
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 06 June 2012 | 127 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 10 May 2011 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 31 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 17 October 2011 | 624 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 09 June 2010 | 129 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window