Financial history ALCOHOL PROBLEMS ADVISORY SERVICE

Charity number: 1070109
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £420.33k £452.36k £493.00k £836.15k £879.97k
Total expenditure £415.33k £402.28k £483.04k £691.19k £726.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £812.68k £112.46k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £23.48k £77.42k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £575.85k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £3.99k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £110.25k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £690.08k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £36.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0