Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL LIBERTY SCHOOL CENTRAL FUND

Charity number: 310923
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 21 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 19 May 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 May 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2014 04 March 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 11 March 2015 On Time