Financial history THE ROYAL LIBERTY SCHOOL CENTRAL FUND

Charity Number: 310923
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £10.82k £43.01k £39.95k £7.48k £6.73k
Total expenditure £23.33k £43.73k £37.53k £12.03k £5.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A