Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF THE MID HERTS CENTRE FOR MUSIC AND ARTS

Charity Number: 311091
Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 November 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 March 2022 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required