Accounts and annual returns MOORE'S EDUCATIONAL
Charity number: 311919
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 September 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2008 | 10 February 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2007 | 23 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2006 | 24 August 2007 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2006 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window