Financial history MOORE'S EDUCATIONAL

Charity number: 311919
Removed charity

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/09/2004 06/09/2005 06/09/2006 06/09/2007 06/09/2008
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A