Financial history LODGE AND WEST DENE EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 312610
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2010 29/02/2012 28/02/2013 28/02/2014 28/02/2015
Total gross income £2.35m £2.07m £37.24k £35.90k £18.83k
Total expenditure £2.72m £1.09m £102.39k £102.66k £933.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Donations and legacies £2.97k £5.17k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £2.23m -£577 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £150 £157 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £117.35k £2.07m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.60m £620.55k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £111.57k £465.67k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A