Governing document LODGE AND WEST DENE EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 312610
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 17 MARCH 1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 8 SEPTEMBER 1969, 10 MARCH 1997 AND 1 FEBRUARY 2008. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31 DECEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE, FOSTER, ASSIST AND PROMOTE IN ANY MANNER WHATSOEVER ANY OBJECT WHICH IS BOTH CHARITABLE AND EDUCATIONAL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.