Accounts and annual returns DAVID SALOMON'S CHARITY

Charity number: 313868
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2013 23 June 2015 235 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 23 June 2015 235 days late
Annual return 31 December 2012 23 June 2015 600 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 23 June 2015 600 days late
Annual return 31 December 2011 23 June 2015 965 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 15 October 2012 On Time