Financial history DAVID SALOMON'S CHARITY

Charity number: 313868
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013
Total gross income £34.41k £36.36k £36.23k £36.76k £37.27k
Total expenditure £52.76k £14.74k £20.78k £134.93k £12.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A