Accounts and annual returns THE ACTS FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 326353
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2015 18 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2014 19 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2013 02 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2012 18 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not Required