Financial history THE ACTS FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 326353
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2011 05/04/2012 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015
Total gross income £15.00k £10.95k £9.91k £9.39k £9.41k
Total expenditure £27.08k £21.16k £23.58k £25.11k £66.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A