Accounts and annual returns THE DICKON TRUST
Charity number: 327202
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 October 2016 | 07 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 October 2015 | 29 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 October 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 October 2014 | 31 March 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 October 2014
(These accounts |
16 September 2015 | 42 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 09 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | 11 September 2013 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window