Financial history THE DICKON TRUST

Charity number: 327202
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2012 05/04/2013 05/10/2014 05/10/2015 05/10/2016
Total gross income £55.23k £58.32k £65.19k £331 £0
Total expenditure £60.39k £62.06k £995.18k £503.79k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0