Accounts and annual returns ROWNTREE MACKINTOSH CONFECTIONERY EMPLOYEES COMMUNITY TRUST FUND (CASTLE FORD)

Charity number: 327990
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 April 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 28 April 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 28 April 2008 08 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2008 Not Required
Annual return 28 April 2007 22 October 2008 237 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 28 April 2006 14 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2006 Not Required