Financial history THE ESSEX SOCIETY HOLIDAY BUNGALOW FUND

Charity number: 1068275
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010
Total gross income £6.02k £5.91k £5.43k £6.64k £9.32k
Total expenditure £5.94k £5.58k £6.18k £7.45k £2.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A