Accounts and annual returns CRESSWELL VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1064661
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2009 07 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2008 22 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2007 04 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2006 24 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2005 09 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2005 Not Required