Accounts and annual returns SOUTH YORKSHIRE FAMILY MEDIATION
Charity number: 1070214
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | 24 June 2010 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | 21 September 2009 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | 29 June 2009 | 29 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 27 June 2008 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | 30 April 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | 06 July 2007 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | 02 February 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | 20 February 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window