Financial history SOUTH YORKSHIRE FAMILY MEDIATION

Charity number: 1070214
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2005 31/07/2006 31/07/2007 31/07/2008 31/07/2009
Total gross income £106.36k £91.78k £81.74k £85.29k £47.00k
Total expenditure £124.38k £99.86k £98.20k £113.30k £37.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A