Financial history ENFIELD HOMESTART

Charity number: 1062412
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £157.81k £59.81k £58.59k £90.73k £0
Total expenditure £166.88k £175.09k £114.90k £101.16k £30.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £54.80k £6.00k £0