Financial history ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY

Charity number: 1062928
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £1.13k £962 £964 £935 £1.01k
Total expenditure £900 £1.14k £1.04k £940 £940
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A