Accounts and annual returns MERE HALL BOLTON LIMITED

Charity number: 1065100
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 25 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 25 November 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 21 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 28 November 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 16 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 22 November 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 09 February 2006 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 09 February 2006 9 days late